HI SCR211 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR211
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Finalization Of Memorandums Of Understanding And Other Actions For Purposes Of Diversifying Sources Of Irrigation In Central Oahu.
Title
Requesting The Finalization Of Memorandums Of Understanding And Other Actions For Purposes Of Diversifying Sources Of Irrigation In Central Oahu.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | Senate | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 843). |
2019-04-22 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-04-22 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Mizuno excused (1). |
2019-04-22 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2290), recommending adoption. |
2019-04-18 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Holt, Yamashita, McDermott. |
2019-04-16 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 04-18-19 11:00AM in conference room 308. |
2019-04-15 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4). |
2019-04-15 | House | Reported from AGR/WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2277), recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-04-12 | House | The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Lowen, Tarnas, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Thielen. |
2019-04-12 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Cachola, Onishi, Perruso, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Holt. |
2019-04-09 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by AGR/WLH on Friday, 04-12-19 11:00AM in conference room 325. |
2019-04-05 | House | Referred to AGR/WLH, FIN, referral sheet 50 |
2019-04-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 644) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-19. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Reported from HWN/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1743) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Fevella. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, K. Kahele, Ihara, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-19 1:17PM in conference room 016. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Referred to HWN/AEN. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR211 (Carry Over) 2019-04-23 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Subjects
Agribusiness Development Corporation
Agriculture
City and County of Honolulu
Irrigation
Office of Hawaiian Affairs
Recycled Water
Wastewater Treatment
Agriculture
City and County of Honolulu
Irrigation
Office of Hawaiian Affairs
Recycled Water
Wastewater Treatment