HI SCR205 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR205
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The State Board On Geographic Names To Consult With Community Members Who Have Direct Traditional, Cultural, And Familial Ties To The District Of Puna To Establish Appropriate Names For The Fissure 8 Vent And Other Features Of The 2018 Eruption Of Kilauea Volcano.
Title
Urging The State Board On Geographic Names To Consult With Community Members Who Have Direct Traditional, Cultural, And Familial Ties To The District Of Puna To Establish Appropriate Names For The Fissure 8 Vent And Other Features Of The 2018 Eruption Of Kilauea Volcano.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-22 | Senate | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 819). |
2019-04-18 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-04-18 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Holt, McDermott, Ohno, Todd excused (5). |
2019-04-18 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2281), recommending adoption. |
2019-04-17 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Creagan, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee, Brower, Lowen, McKelvey. |
2019-04-15 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 04-17-19 3:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-04-15 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4). |
2019-04-15 | House | Reported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2270), recommending referral to JUD. |
2019-04-12 | House | The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Lowen, Tarnas, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Thielen. |
2019-04-10 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by WLH on Friday, 04-12-19 10:30AM in conference room 325. |
2019-04-05 | House | Referred to WLH, JUD, referral sheet 50 |
2019-04-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 642). |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-19. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1800) with recommendation of adoption. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Riviere. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-19 1:20PM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Referred to WTL. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR205 (Carry Over) 2019-04-22 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HCR150 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Referred to WLH, JUD, referral sheet 33
HCR150 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Referred to WLH, JUD, referral sheet 33
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=205&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SCR205_.HTM |