HI SCR188 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The Office Of Hawaiian Affairs To Complete The 2017 Independent Financial Audit And Management Review Of The Office Of Hawaiian Affairs And Its Subsidiaries.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The Office Of Hawaiian Affairs To Complete The 2017 Independent Financial Audit And Management Review Of The Office Of Hawaiian Affairs And Its Subsidiaries.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-15HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
2019-04-15HouseReported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2262), recommending referral to FIN.
2019-04-12HouseThe committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Lowen, Tarnas, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Thielen.
2019-04-10HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by WLH on Friday, 04-12-19 10:30AM in conference room 325.
2019-04-05HouseReferred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 50
2019-04-04HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 638).
2019-04-04SenateReport and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
2019-04-03SenateOne Day Notice 04-04-19.
2019-04-03SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1845) with recommendation of adoption.
2019-04-01SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Taniguchi.
2019-03-29SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-01-19 10:20AM in conference room 211.
2019-03-27SenateReport adopted, referred to WAM.
2019-03-27SenateReported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1557), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
2019-03-21SenateThe committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HWN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Ihara, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, J.Keohokalole.
2019-03-19SenateThe committee(s) on HWN deferred the measure until 03-21-19 1:15PM in conference room 016.
2019-03-15SenateThe committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-19 1:18PM in conference room 016.
2019-03-13SenateReferred to HWN, WAM.
2019-03-08SenateOffered.

Same As/Similar To

HCR188 (Same As) 2019-04-22 - Resolution adopted in final form.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback