HI SCR186 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - Referred to TIA, LHE, referral sheet 50
Pending: House Tourism & International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Encouraging Support For The First Cohort Of Underprivileged, Economically-disadvantaged Students In Hawaii To Study At Elite Schools In Asia Through The 2020 Hawaii-asia Youth Program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Encouraging Support For The First Cohort Of Underprivileged, Economically-disadvantaged Students In Hawaii To Study At Elite Schools In Asia Through The 2020 Hawaii-asia Youth Program.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-05HouseReferred to TIA, LHE, referral sheet 50
2019-04-04HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 637).
2019-04-04SenateReport and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
2019-04-03SenateOne Day Notice 04-04-19.
2019-04-03SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1844) with recommendation of adoption.
2019-04-01SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Taniguchi.
2019-03-29SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-01-19 10:20AM in conference room 211.
2019-03-27SenateReport adopted, referred to WAM.
2019-03-27SenateReported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1618), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
2019-03-18SenateThe committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz.
2019-03-15SenateThe committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-19 2:45PM in conference room 229.
2019-03-15SenateRe-Referred to EDU, WAM.
2019-03-13SenateReferred to EDU/HMS, WAM.
2019-03-08SenateOffered.

Same As/Similar To

HCR34 (Same As) 2019-03-07 - Referred to TIA, LHE, referral sheet 27

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback