HI SCR186 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-01 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-01 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Hawaiian Home Lands To Consider Building Affordable Rental Housing That Could Be Used For Transitional, Permanent, Or Rent-to-own Housing For Native Hawaiians, Including Homeless Native Hawaiians.
Title
Department of Hawaiian Home Lands; Housing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-01 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Reported from THA/HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1172), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Slom. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on THA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in THA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Galuteria, Keith-Agaran, Kahele, Kidani, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Hee, Solomon, Slom. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on THA/HMS added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 03-25-13 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Referred to THA/HMS, WAM. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=186&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/SCR186_.HTM |