HI SCR179 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The City Council Of The City And County Of Honolulu To Require A Conditional Use Permit-major For Any And All Allowed Uses, Except For Certain Utility Installations, On Lands In P-2 General Preservation Districts That Are Within One Hundred Feet Of A Residential Area.
Title
Requesting The City Council Of The City And County Of Honolulu To Require A Conditional Use Permit-major For Any And All Allowed Uses, Except For Certain Utility Installations, On Lands In P-2 General Preservation Districts That Are Within One Hundred Feet Of A Residential Area.
Sponsors
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Breene Harimoto [D] |
Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Reported from WTL/HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3336), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Green, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, K. Kahele. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Inouye, Riviere, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-18 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Referred to WTL/HOU, WAM. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR212 (Same As) 2018-04-12 - Re-Referred to WTL/PSM.