HI SCR177 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR177
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The State And The Counties To Implement The Recommendations Of The Hawaii Sea Level Rise Vulnerability And Adaptation Report.
Title
Requesting The State And The Counties To Implement The Recommendations Of The Hawaii Sea Level Rise Vulnerability And Adaptation Report.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Reported from WTL/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3317), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Riviere, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Baker. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-18 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Referred to WTL/PSM, WAM. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR177 (Carry Over) 2017-03-15 - Referred to IAA/WTL.
HCR234 (Same As) 2018-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
HCR234 (Same As) 2018-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=177&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SCR177_.HTM |