HI SCR176 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR176
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - Referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 32
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - Referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 32
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Health To Explore Ways It Can Exercise Oversight Over Community Health Centers And Other Medical Service Entities When A Danger To The Community's Health Exists.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Health To Explore Ways It Can Exercise Oversight Over Community Health Centers And Other Medical Service Entities When A Danger To The Community's Health Exists.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | House | Referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 32 |
2021-03-31 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 559). |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-31-21. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1411) with recommendation of adoption. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, Moriwaki, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-29-21 1:20PM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Referred to HTH. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR176 (Carry Over) 2021-04-01 - Referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 32
HCR148 (Same As) 2021-03-24 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
SR141 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
HCR148 (Same As) 2021-03-24 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
SR141 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.