HI SCR172 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR172
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-18 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno, Woodson excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-18 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno, Woodson excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Agriculture To Expand Quarantine Facilities Administered By The Plant Quarantine Branch.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Agriculture To Expand Quarantine Facilities Administered By The Plant Quarantine Branch.
Sponsors
Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-13 - House - House Agriculture: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-18 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno, Woodson excused (2). |
2022-04-18 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2041-22), recommending referral to FIN. |
2022-04-13 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Perruso, Lowen, Marten, Matayoshi, Todd, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka. |
2022-04-08 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 04-13-22 11:00AM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-04-04 | House | Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 42 |
2022-04-01 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 580). |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-01-22. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3570) with recommendation of adoption. |
2022-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Acasio, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Referred to AEN. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR172 (Carry Over) 2021-03-16 - Referred to GVO/HTH.
SR165 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
SR165 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.