HI SCR171 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The Auditor To Assess The Social And Financial Effects Of Requiring Health Insurers To Provide Coverage For Clinical Victim Support Services For Victims Of Sexual Violence And Abuse.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The Auditor To Assess The Social And Financial Effects Of Requiring Health Insurers To Provide Coverage For Clinical Victim Support Services For Victims Of Sexual Violence And Abuse.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-23SenateResolution adopted in final form.
2019-04-23SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 841).
2019-04-22HouseTransmitted to Senate.
2019-04-22HouseAdopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Mizuno excused (1).
2019-04-22HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2289), recommending adoption.
2019-04-18HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Holt, Yamashita, McDermott.
2019-04-16HouseScheduled for decision making on Thursday, 04-18-19 11:00AM in conference room 308.
2019-04-15HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
2019-04-15HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2225), recommending referral to FIN.
2019-04-11HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Cachola, Har, Kong, Onishi; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Mizuno, Matsumoto.
2019-04-08HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 04-11-19 2:00PM in conference room 329.
2019-04-05HouseReferred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 50
2019-04-03HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 574) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-04-03SenateReport and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-02SenateOne Day Notice 04-03-19.
2019-04-02SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1692) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
2019-03-28SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang, Ruderman, Fevella.
2019-03-22SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-19 9:00AM in conference room 229.
2019-03-18SenateRe-Referred to CPH.
2019-03-13SenateReferred to GVO/CPH, JDC/WAM.
2019-03-08SenateOffered.

Same As/Similar To

HCR93 (Same As) 2019-04-09 - Referred to CPH/WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback