HI SCR168 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR168
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Hawaiian Home Lands, Department Of Transportation Highways Division, And Hawaii County To Collectively Develop A Plan To Improve Mealani Road And Establish A Protocol To Use Mealani Road As An Emergency Bypass Route When Mamalahoa Highway Is Inaccessible.
Title
Urging The Department Of Hawaiian Home Lands, Department Of Transportation Highways Division, And Hawaii County To Collectively Develop A Plan To Improve Mealani Road And Establish A Protocol To Use Mealani Road As An Emergency Bypass Route When Mamalahoa Highway Is Inaccessible.
Sponsors
Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] |
Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice. |
2020-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN/TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-20 2:10PM in conference room 016. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Referred to HWN/TRS. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR168 (Carry Over) 2019-03-13 - Referred to HRE, JDC/WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=168&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SCR168_.HTM |