HI SCR167 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR167
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-18 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno, Woodson excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-18 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno, Woodson excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Transportation To Convene An Intergovernmental Task Force To Recommend Policy And Provide Guidance To Assist The County Of Hawaii In The Establishment And Formation Of A Metropolitan Planning Organization Or A Regional Transportation Planning Organization.
Title
Urging The Department Of Transportation To Convene An Intergovernmental Task Force To Recommend Policy And Provide Guidance To Assist The County Of Hawaii In The Establishment And Formation Of A Metropolitan Planning Organization Or A Regional Transportation Planning Organization.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-13 - House - House Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-18 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno, Woodson excused (2). |
2022-04-18 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2044-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2022-04-13 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Ilagan, Clark, Hashimoto, LoPresti, Nakamura, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kitagawa, Takumi. |
2022-04-11 | House | Resolution re-scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 04-13-22 11:00AM in conference room 423 Via Videoconference. |
2022-04-08 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 04-13-22 10:45AM in conference room 423 Via Videoconference. |
2022-04-04 | House | Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 44 |
2022-04-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 602) in amended form (SD 1). |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2022-04-01 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-22. |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Reported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3605) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, DeCoite, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Fevella. |
2022-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-22 3:20PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Referred to TRS. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR167 (Carry Over) 2021-03-16 - Referred to HRE/HMS/EDU.
SR159 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
SR159 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Subjects
Certification
County of Hawaii
Department of Transportation
Metropolitan Planning Organization
Task Force
Transportation Improvement Program
County of Hawaii
Department of Transportation
Metropolitan Planning Organization
Task Force
Transportation Improvement Program