HI SCR167 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR167
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Transportation And The Counties To Reevaluate Current Crosswalk Locations And The Need For New Crosswalks.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Transportation And The Counties To Reevaluate Current Crosswalk Locations And The Need For New Crosswalks.
Sponsors
Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] |
Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice. |
2020-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-20 1:30PM in conference room 225. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Referred to TRS. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR167 (Carry Over) 2019-03-22 - The committee on EET deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=167&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SCR167_.HTM |