HI SCR162 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR162
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-20 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-20 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Health, University Of Hawaii, And Other Relevant State Agencies To Conduct A Statewide Dna Study To Determine Whether Residents Of The State With The Genetic Variant Rs12252-c May Be At A Heightened Risk Of Influenza.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Health, University Of Hawaii, And Other Relevant State Agencies To Conduct A Statewide Dna Study To Determine Whether Residents Of The State With The Genetic Variant Rs12252-c May Be At A Heightened Risk Of Influenza.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-20 | Senate | The committee on CPH deferred the measure. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | The committee on HRE deferred the measure. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH/HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-19 10:45AM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Referred to CPH/HRE, WAM. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR162 (Carry Over) 2019-03-20 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=162&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SCR162_.HTM |