HI SCR160 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR160
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-07 - Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 41
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-07 - Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 41
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting That The University Of Hawaii Provide Information To The Legislature On Possible Techniques To Eliminate Mosquitos From Hawaii.
Title
Requesting That The University Of Hawaii Provide Information To The Legislature On Possible Techniques To Eliminate Mosquitos From Hawaii.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-07 | House | Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 41 |
2017-04-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 471) in amended form (SD 2). |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 2). Transmitted to House. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1429) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 2). |
2017-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-17 9:45AM in conference room 211. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Reported from HRE/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1227), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Riviere, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Ruderman. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Kidani, Espero, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-17 1:45PM in conference room 414. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Referred to HRE/AEN, WAM. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR160 (Carry Over) 2017-04-07 - Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 41
HCR95 (Same As) 2017-03-13 - Referred to HLT, HED, referral sheet 29
HCR95 (Same As) 2017-03-13 - Referred to HLT, HED, referral sheet 29