HI SCR160 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-22 - (S) The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-22 - (S) The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Land And Natural Resources To Approve And The Department Of Accounting And General Services To Plan And Implement The Legislature's Proposal To Replace The Reflecting Ponds Surrounding The State Capitol With A Garden Of Native Plants.
Title
State Capitol; Reflecting Pools; Replacement with Garden
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-22 | (S) The committee on WTL deferred the measure. | |
2010-03-18 | (S) The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-10 3:15PM in conference room 229. | |
2010-03-10 | (S) Referred to WTL, JGO. | |
2010-03-08 | (S) Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=160&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/SCR160_.HTM |