HI SCR158 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR158
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - Referred to TRN, CPC, referral sheet 32
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - Referred to TRN, CPC, referral sheet 32
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The United States Congress, The Federal Aviation Administration, And The Hawaii Department Of Transportation To Take Every Action Necessary To Address Rapidly Increasing Safety Risks And Community Disruption Resulting From Insufficient Regulation Of Tour Helicopter And Small Aircraft Operations Throughout Hawaii Skies.
Title
Urging The United States Congress, The Federal Aviation Administration, And The Hawaii Department Of Transportation To Take Every Action Necessary To Address Rapidly Increasing Safety Risks And Community Disruption Resulting From Insufficient Regulation Of Tour Helicopter And Small Aircraft Operations Throughout Hawaii Skies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | House | Referred to TRN, CPC, referral sheet 32 |
2021-03-31 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 545) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-31-21. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Reported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1362) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-21 3:00PM; CR 224 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Referred to TRS. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR158 (Carry Over) 2021-04-01 - Referred to TRN, CPC, referral sheet 32
SR123 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
SR123 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
Subjects
FAA
Hawaii Air Noise and Safety Task Force
National Parks Air Tour Management Act of 2000
NTSB
Safe and Quiet Skies Act
Small Aircraft
Tour Helicopters
Hawaii Air Noise and Safety Task Force
National Parks Air Tour Management Act of 2000
NTSB
Safe and Quiet Skies Act
Small Aircraft
Tour Helicopters