HI SCR158 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - Referred to TIA/WLH, FIN, referral sheet 50
Pending: House Tourism & International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Encouraging The Hawaii Tourism Authority And The Department Of Land And Natural Resources' State Historic Preservation Division To Work With Community Organizations To Assist In The Establishment Of Historical Markers And Trails.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Encouraging The Hawaii Tourism Authority And The Department Of Land And Natural Resources' State Historic Preservation Division To Work With Community Organizations To Assist In The Establishment Of Historical Markers And Trails.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-05HouseReferred to TIA/WLH, FIN, referral sheet 50
2019-04-03HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 571).
2019-04-03SenateReport and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
2019-04-02SenateOne Day Notice 04-03-19.
2019-04-02SenateReported from EET/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1710) with recommendation of adoption.
2019-03-27SenateThe committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Riviere.
2019-03-27SenateThe committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EET were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, Inouye, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-03-21SenateThe committee(s) on EET/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-19 1:15PM in conference room 229.
2019-03-13SenateReferred to EET/WTL.
2019-03-08SenateOffered.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback