HI SCR157 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 49
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The Department Of Agriculture To Develop A Sustainable Food Security Strategic Plan And Prepare An Annual Report To The Legislature.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The Department Of Agriculture To Develop A Sustainable Food Security Strategic Plan And Prepare An Annual Report To The Legislature.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03HouseReferred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 49
2019-04-01HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 547).
2019-04-01SenateReport and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
2019-03-29SenateOne Day Notice 04-01-19.
2019-03-29SenateReported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1657) with recommendation of adoption.
2019-03-20SenateThe committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, K. Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman, L. Thielen.
2019-03-14SenateThe committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-19 2:25PM in conference room 224.
2019-03-13SenateReferred to AEN.
2019-03-08SenateOffered.

Same As/Similar To

HCR81 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 33

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback