HI SCR155 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR155
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 32
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 32
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The State Auditor To Perform An Audit Of The Department Of Education's Office Of Curriculum And Instructional Design.
Title
Requesting The State Auditor To Perform An Audit Of The Department Of Education's Office Of Curriculum And Instructional Design.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 32 |
2021-03-31 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 544). |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-31-21. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Reported from GVO/EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1352) with recommendation of adoption. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Dela Cruz, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Dela Cruz, Gabbard, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Chang. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO/EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-24-21 3:00PM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Referred to GVO/EDU. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR155 (Carry Over) 2021-04-01 - Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 32
SR120 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
SR120 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.