HI SCR155 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Referred to WLH/EEP/TRN, JUD, referral sheet 49
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urging All Applicable State Agencies To Work Together With Interested Stakeholders, Including The Honolulu Harbor Users Group, In Assessing The Risk Of Aquatic Invasive Species To Hawaii, Vectors, And Possible Mitigations, In Preparation For The Establishment Of New Federal Standards In 2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging All Applicable State Agencies To Work Together With Interested Stakeholders, Including The Honolulu Harbor Users Group, In Assessing The Risk Of Aquatic Invasive Species To Hawaii, Vectors, And Possible Mitigations, In Preparation For The Establishment Of New Federal Standards In 2022.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03HouseReferred to WLH/EEP/TRN, JUD, referral sheet 49
2019-04-02HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 553).
2019-04-02SenateReport and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
2019-04-01SenateOne Day Notice 04-02-19.
2019-04-01SenateReported from GVO/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1676) with recommendation of adoption.
2019-03-22SenateThe committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Baker, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Fevella.
2019-03-22SenateThe committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman, Fevella.
2019-03-19SenateThe committee(s) on GVO/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-19 1:30PM in conference room 224.
2019-03-13SenateReferred to GVO/AEN.
2019-03-08SenateOffered.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback