HI SCR154 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - Referred to LHE, LMG, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 50
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The University Of Hawaii Office Of Internal Audit To Conduct An Audit Of Various Programs At The University Of Hawaii West Oahu That Receive Extramural Funding, Including Title Iii Grant Funding.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The University Of Hawaii Office Of Internal Audit To Conduct An Audit Of Various Programs At The University Of Hawaii West Oahu That Receive Extramural Funding, Including Title Iii Grant Funding.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-05HouseReferred to LHE, LMG, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 50
2019-04-04HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 630).
2019-04-04SenateReport and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
2019-04-03SenateOne Day Notice 04-04-19.
2019-04-03SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1840) with recommendation of adoption.
2019-04-03SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele.
2019-04-01SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-19 10:30AM in conference room 211.
2019-03-27SenateReport adopted, referred to WAM.
2019-03-27SenateReported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1649), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
2019-03-21SenateThe committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Keith-Agaran, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele.
2019-03-18SenateThe committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-19 3:00PM in conference room 229.
2019-03-13SenateReferred to HRE, WAM.
2019-03-08SenateOffered.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback