HI SCR151 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-19 - (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on WLO/EEP with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ching, Tokioka excused (2).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-19 - (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on WLO/EEP with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ching, Tokioka excused (2).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Land And Natural Resources, Department Of Health, And Office Of Planning To Streamline The Permitting Process For The Restoration Of Hawaiian Fishponds.
Title
Hawaiian Fishponds; DLNR; DOH; Office of Planning
Sponsors
Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Clayton Hee [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Pohai Ryan [D] |
Sen. Malama Solomon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-19 | (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on WLO/EEP with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ching, Tokioka excused (2). | |
2012-04-19 | (H) Reported from HAW (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1786-12), recommending referral to WLO/EEP. | |
2012-04-18 | (H) The committees on HAW recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, C. Lee, Jordan, Morikawa, Wooley, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Mizuno, Yamane, Pine. | |
2012-04-13 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by HAW on Wednesday, 04-18-12 10:00AM in conference room 312. | |
2012-04-13 | (H) Referred to HAW, WLO/EEP, referral sheet 64 | |
2012-04-10 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 483) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2012-04-10 | (S) Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-04-05 | (S) One Day Notice 04-10-12. | |
2012-04-05 | (S) Reported from WLH/HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3214) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). | |
2012-03-27 | (S) The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Galuteria, Ryan, English, Kahele, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Hee, Solomon, Slom. | |
2012-03-27 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WLH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Ryan, Shimabukuro, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Solomon, Fukunaga, Slom. | |
2012-03-23 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH/HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-12 1:15PM in conference room 225. | |
2012-03-16 | (S) Referred to WLH/HWN. | |
2012-03-14 | (S) Offered. |