HI SCR15 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR15
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Approving The Sale Of The Leased Fee Interest In 41-1373 Haunaukoi Street, Waimanalo, Hawaii.
Title
Approving The Sale Of The Leased Fee Interest In 41-1373 Haunaukoi Street, Waimanalo, Hawaii.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | Senate | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 645). |
2018-04-23 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-04-23 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Evans, Hashem, Say excused (3). |
2018-04-23 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2062-18), recommending adoption. |
2018-04-19 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto, Tupola, Ward. |
2018-04-17 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 04-19-18 11:00AM in conference room 309. |
2018-04-16 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Lowen, McKelvey, Mizuno, Nakamura, Quinlan, Tokioka excused (7). |
2018-04-16 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1995-18), recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-04-12 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Nakamura, Hashem, San Buenaventura; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Quinlan, McDermott. |
2018-04-10 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HSG on Thursday, 04-12-18 11:00AM in conference room 423. |
2018-04-04 | House | Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 52 |
2018-04-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 471) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-03-18. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3353) with recommendation of adoption. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-13-18 10:15AM in conference room 211. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2559), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Inouye, Riviere, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-21-18 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR15 (Carry Over) 2017-04-20 - The committee(s) on HED recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HCR8 (Same As) 2018-03-15 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Fukumoto, Har, Hashem, Lowen, McDermott, Nakashima, Souki excused (7).
HCR8 (Same As) 2018-03-15 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Fukumoto, Har, Hashem, Lowen, McDermott, Nakashima, Souki excused (7).