HI SCR145 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR145
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-16 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Lowen, McKelvey, Mizuno, Nakamura, Quinlan, Tokioka excused (7).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-16 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Lowen, McKelvey, Mizuno, Nakamura, Quinlan, Tokioka excused (7).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Agriculture, In Collaboration With The Department Of Labor And Industrial Relations, To Convene An Agriculture Labor Task Force.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Agriculture, In Collaboration With The Department Of Labor And Industrial Relations, To Convene An Agriculture Labor Task Force.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Breene Harimoto [D] |
Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-16 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Lowen, McKelvey, Mizuno, Nakamura, Quinlan, Tokioka excused (7). |
2018-04-16 | House | Reported from AGR/LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2033-18), recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-04-13 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Evans, Ichiyama, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Keohokalole. |
2018-04-13 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, Gates, Ing, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Say, Thielen. |
2018-04-10 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by AGR/LAB on Friday, 04-13-18 10:20AM in conference room 312. |
2018-04-10 | House | Referred to AGR/LAB, FIN, referral sheet 54 |
2018-04-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 482) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-18. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Reported from AEN/LBR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3374) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBR recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBR were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, S. Chang, Ihara, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Riviere, K. Rhoads, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN/LBR has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-18 1:15PM in conference room 224. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Referred to AEN/LBR. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR145 (Carry Over) 2017-05-30 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17.
HCR215 (Same As) 2018-03-13 - Referred to AGR/LAB, FIN, referral sheet 39
HCR215 (Same As) 2018-03-13 - Referred to AGR/LAB, FIN, referral sheet 39