HI SCR144 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The Legislature To Recalculate And Establish The Transient Accommodations Tax Allocation Of Each County Based Upon The Population Growth From 2010 To 2017 In Each County.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The Legislature To Recalculate And Establish The Transient Accommodations Tax Allocation Of Each County Based Upon The Population Growth From 2010 To 2017 In Each County.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27SenateReport adopted, referred to WAM.
2019-03-27SenateReported from EET/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1572), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
2019-03-25SenateThe committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EET were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) J.Keohokalole; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye.
2019-03-25SenateThe committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Harimoto.
2019-03-21SenateThe committee(s) on EET/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-25-19 2:55PM in conference room 414.
2019-03-13SenateReferred to EET/PSM, WAM.
2019-03-08SenateOffered.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback