HI SCR142 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR142
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-23 - The committee on GVO deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-23 - The committee on GVO deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Auditor To Update Its Report No. 12-09, Which Assesses The Social And Financial Effects Of Mandatory Health Insurance Coverage For Fertility Preservation Procedures For Persons Of Reproductive Age Who Have Been Diagnosed With Cancer.
Title
Requesting The Auditor To Update Its Report No. 12-09, Which Assesses The Social And Financial Effects Of Mandatory Health Insurance Coverage For Fertility Preservation Procedures For Persons Of Reproductive Age Who Have Been Diagnosed With Cancer.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-23 | Senate | The committee on GVO deferred the measure. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | The committee on CPN deferred the measure. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO deferred the measure until 03-23-21 3:01PM; CR 016 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-21 9:30AM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Referred to GVO/CPN. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR142 (Carry Over) 2021-03-23 - The committee on GVO deferred the measure.
HCR110 (Same As) 2021-04-01 - Referred to GVO, CPN.
HCR110 (Same As) 2021-04-01 - Referred to GVO, CPN.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=142&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/SCR142_.HTM |