HI SCR141 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR141
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing A Task Force To Plan And Coordinate The Celebration Of The One Hundred Fiftieth Anniversary Of The First Arrival Of Japanese Emigrants To Hawaii.
Title
Establishing A Task Force To Plan And Coordinate The Celebration Of The One Hundred Fiftieth Anniversary Of The First Arrival Of Japanese Emigrants To Hawaii.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-30 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 613). |
2017-04-21 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-04-21 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, Ing, Ito, Souki, Takumi, Tokioka excused (8). |
2017-04-21 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1814), recommending adoption. |
2017-04-20 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Yamashita, Tupola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Quinlan. |
2017-04-18 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 04-20-17 10:45AM in conference room 308. |
2017-04-17 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kobayashi, C. Lee, McKelvey, Oshiro, Souki excused (6). |
2017-04-17 | House | Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1781), recommending referral to FIN. |
2017-04-13 | House | The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Ito, Cachola, Choy, Ohno, Onishi; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka, Woodson, Ward. |
2017-04-10 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by VMI on Thursday, 04-13-17 9:30AM in conference room 429. |
2017-04-07 | House | Referred to VMI, FIN, referral sheet 41 |
2017-04-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 463). |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1389) with recommendation of adoption. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-17 9:45AM in conference room 211. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Reported from IAA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1195), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on IAA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in IAA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, S. Chang, Ihara, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on IAA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-17 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Referred to IAA, WAM. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR141 (Carry Over) 2017-05-30 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17.
HCR179 (Same As) 2017-03-29 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4).
HCR179 (Same As) 2017-03-29 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=141&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/SCR141_.HTM |