HI SCR134 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - Referred to LAB/AGR, FIN, referral sheet 50
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The Department Of Labor And Industrial Relations, In Collaboration With The Department Of Agriculture, And Department Of Business, Economic Development, And Tourism, To Submit A Report Determining A Living Wage Standard For Agricultural Workers Living In The State.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The Department Of Labor And Industrial Relations, In Collaboration With The Department Of Agriculture, And Department Of Business, Economic Development, And Tourism, To Submit A Report Determining A Living Wage Standard For Agricultural Workers Living In The State.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-05HouseReferred to LAB/AGR, FIN, referral sheet 50
2019-04-04HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 625) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-04-04SenateReport and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-03SenateOne Day Notice 04-04-19.
2019-04-03SenateReported from LCA/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1755) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
2019-03-27SenateThe committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman.
2019-03-27SenateThe committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, Gabbard, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang.
2019-03-22SenateThe committee(s) on LCA/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-19 2:15PM in conference room 224.
2019-03-13SenateReferred to LCA/AEN.
2019-03-08SenateOffered.

Same As/Similar To

HCR54 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Referred to LAB/AGR, FIN, referral sheet 33

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback