HI SCR133 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Saiki, Say, Thielen excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The Harbors Division Of The Department Of Transportation To Inform The Maritime Community Of The Procedures To Be Taken In Preparation Of A Storm And Assist The Maritime Community With Submitting Their Application For A Maritime Heavy Weather And Hurricane Plan.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The Harbors Division Of The Department Of Transportation To Inform The Maritime Community Of The Procedures To Be Taken In Preparation Of A Storm And Assist The Maritime Community With Submitting Their Application For A Maritime Heavy Weather And Hurricane Plan.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-12HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Saiki, Say, Thielen excused (4).
2019-04-12HouseReported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2218), recommending referral to FIN.
2019-04-10HouseThe committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Hashimoto, Brower, Cullen, Matayoshi, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, McDermott.
2019-04-08HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 04-10-19 10:30AM in conference room 423.
2019-04-05HouseReferred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 50
2019-04-04HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 624) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-04-04SenateReport and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-03SenateOne Day Notice 04-04-19.
2019-04-03SenateReported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1748) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
2019-04-01SenateThe committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, English.
2019-03-28SenateThe committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 04-01-19 1:15PM in conference room 225.
2019-03-28SenateRe-Referred to TRS.
2019-03-13SenateReferred to TRS, WAM.
2019-03-08SenateOffered.

Same As/Similar To

HCR164 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 33

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback