HI SCR130 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-22 - (S) The committee on TIA deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-22 - (S) The committee on TIA deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting A Study To Determine If Savings May Be Achieved By Having The Highways, Harbors, And Airports Divisions Share Certain Common Functions.
Title
LRB Study; DOT; Divisional Consolidation of Common Functions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-22 | (S) The committee on TIA deferred the measure. | |
2010-03-17 | (S) The committee(s) on TIA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-10 1:15PM in conference room 224. | |
2010-03-10 | (S) Referred to TIA. | |
2010-03-04 | (S) Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR58 (Same As) 2010-03-22 - (S) The committee on TIA deferred the measure.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=130&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/SCR130_.HTM |