HI SCR129 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR129
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-13 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Fukumoto, C. Lee, McKelvey, Mizuno, Woodson excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-13 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Fukumoto, C. Lee, McKelvey, Mizuno, Woodson excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Health To Convene A Task Force To Examine How A Statewide Use Of Domestic Violence Assessments And Response Protocol By Emergency Medical Services Personnel Can Help To Strengthen The State's Overall Response To Domestic Violence.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Health To Convene A Task Force To Examine How A Statewide Use Of Domestic Violence Assessments And Response Protocol By Emergency Medical Services Personnel Can Help To Strengthen The State's Overall Response To Domestic Violence.
Sponsors
Sen. Laura Thielen [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] |
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] | Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-13 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Fukumoto, C. Lee, McKelvey, Mizuno, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-04-13 | House | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1993-18), recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-04-12 | House | The committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Belatti, Learmont; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola. |
2018-04-10 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HHS on Thursday, 04-12-18 10:00AM in conference room 329. |
2018-04-10 | House | Referred to HHS, FIN, referral sheet 53 |
2018-04-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 528) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Reported from CPH/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3466) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, K. Rhoads, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Nishihara. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH/JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 04-03-18 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH/JDC. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Referred to CPH/JDC, WAM. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR129 (Carry Over) 2017-04-07 - Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 41
HCR148 (Same As) 2018-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
HCR148 (Same As) 2018-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).