HI SCR125 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - Referred to LHE/LAB, FIN, referral sheet 50
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urging The University Of Hawaii, In Consultation With Its Facilities Offices, The Department Of Accounting And General Services, And Industry Representatives, To Develop An Integrated Plan To Provide Certificates, Degrees, And Associated Pathways In The Areas Of Facilities Maintenance And Construction Management.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging The University Of Hawaii, In Consultation With Its Facilities Offices, The Department Of Accounting And General Services, And Industry Representatives, To Develop An Integrated Plan To Provide Certificates, Degrees, And Associated Pathways In The Areas Of Facilities Maintenance And Construction Management.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-05HouseReferred to LHE/LAB, FIN, referral sheet 50
2019-04-04HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 621).
2019-04-04SenateReport and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
2019-04-03SenateOne Day Notice 04-04-19.
2019-04-03SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1838) with recommendation of adoption.
2019-04-01SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Taniguchi.
2019-03-29SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-01-19 10:20AM in conference room 211.
2019-03-27SenateReport adopted, referred to WAM.
2019-03-27SenateReported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1538), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
2019-03-21SenateThe committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Keith-Agaran, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele.
2019-03-18SenateThe committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-19 3:00PM in conference room 229.
2019-03-12SenateReferred to HRE, WAM.
2019-03-08SenateOffered.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback