HI SCR124 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Urging The Governor, In Coordination With The Department Of Land And Natural Resources, To Establish And Implement A Tree Planting Program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging The Governor, In Coordination With The Department Of Land And Natural Resources, To Establish And Implement A Tree Planting Program.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-15HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
2019-04-15HouseReported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2227), recommending referral to FIN.
2019-04-11HouseThe committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Tarnas, Todd, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Yamane.
2019-04-08HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 04-11-19 9:40AM in conference room 325.
2019-04-05HouseReferred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 50
2019-04-04HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 620) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-04-04SenateReport and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
2019-04-03SenateOne Day Notice 04-04-19.
2019-04-03SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1837) with recommendation of adoption.
2019-04-01SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Taniguchi.
2019-03-29SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-01-19 10:20AM in conference room 211.
2019-03-27SenateReport adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-03-27SenateReported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1610), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
2019-03-18SenateThe committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Fevella.
2019-03-15SenateThe committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-19 2:50PM in conference room 225.
2019-03-12SenateReferred to WTL, WAM.
2019-03-08SenateOffered.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback