HI SCR124 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR124
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-15 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-15 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Governor, In Coordination With The Department Of Land And Natural Resources, To Establish And Implement A Tree Planting Program.
Title
Urging The Governor, In Coordination With The Department Of Land And Natural Resources, To Establish And Implement A Tree Planting Program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4). |
2019-04-15 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2227), recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-04-11 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Tarnas, Todd, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Yamane. |
2019-04-08 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 04-11-19 9:40AM in conference room 325. |
2019-04-05 | House | Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 50 |
2019-04-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 620) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-19. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1837) with recommendation of adoption. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Taniguchi. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-01-19 10:20AM in conference room 211. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1610), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Fevella. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-19 2:50PM in conference room 225. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR124 (Carry Over) 2019-04-15 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).