HI SCR121 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SCR121

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urging The Retail Merchants Of Hawaii To Establish A Policy To Prohibit Supplies Purchased During Emergencies From Being Returned To Stores.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging The Retail Merchants Of Hawaii To Establish A Policy To Prohibit Supplies Purchased During Emergencies From Being Returned To Stores.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16SenateThe hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
2020-03-13SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-20 9:30AM in conference room 229.
2020-03-06SenateReferred to CPH, JDC.
2020-03-06SenateOffered.

Same As/Similar To

SCR121 (Carry Over) 2019-04-15 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback