HI SCR120 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR120
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Hawaii Developmental Disabilities Council To Convene A Working Group To Identify Strategies And Agreements To Better Coordinate Services Provided To Individuals With Intellectual And Developmental Disabilities And Their Families.
Title
Requesting The Hawaii Developmental Disabilities Council To Convene A Working Group To Identify Strategies And Agreements To Better Coordinate Services Provided To Individuals With Intellectual And Developmental Disabilities And Their Families.
Sponsors
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | Senate | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 837). |
2019-04-22 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-04-22 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Mizuno excused (1). |
2019-04-22 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2288), recommending adoption. |
2019-04-18 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Holt, Yamashita, McDermott. |
2019-04-16 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 04-18-19 11:00AM in conference room 308. |
2019-04-15 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4). |
2019-04-15 | House | Reported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2239), recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-04-12 | House | The committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Nakamura, B. Kobayashi, Mizuno, Say, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti. |
2019-04-09 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HSH on Friday, 04-12-19 9:00AM in conference room 329. |
2019-04-05 | House | Referred to HSH, FIN, referral sheet 50 |
2019-04-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 567) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-03-19. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1719) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) J.Keohokalole. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-19 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Referred to CPH. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR120 (Carry Over) 2019-04-23 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HCR130 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Referred to HSH, FIN, referral sheet 33
HCR130 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Referred to HSH, FIN, referral sheet 33
Subjects
Department of Health
Department of Human Services
Department of Labor and Industrial Relations
Development Disabilities
Vocational Rehabilitation
Working Group
Department of Human Services
Department of Labor and Industrial Relations
Development Disabilities
Vocational Rehabilitation
Working Group