HI SCR119 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-08 - Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 47
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-08 - Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 47
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The University Of Hawaii At Manoa To Fund And Fill The Vacant African American Studies Faculty Tenure Line Position At The College Of Social Sciences.
Title
University of Hawaii at Manoa; African Americans
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-08 | House | Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 47 |
2016-04-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 450). |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3422) with recommendation of adoption. |
2016-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Wakai, Slom. |
2016-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-05-16 1:00PM in conference room 211. |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Reported from HEA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3248), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2016-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on HEA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HEA were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, K.Kahele, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Slom. |
2016-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on HEA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-29-16 1:15PM in conference room 224. |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Referred to HEA, WAM. |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=119&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SCR119_.HTM |