HI SCR116 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-01 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The Hawaii Access To Justice Commission To Convene A Working Group To Develop An Educational Loan Repayment Program For William S. Richardson School Of Law Graduates To Expand Opportunities To Pursue Public Interest Careers In Hawaii That Directly Serve Underserved Communities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hawaii Access to Justice Commission; Law School Loan Repayment

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-01SenateResolution adopted in final form.
2014-05-01SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 743).
2014-04-29HouseTransmitted to Senate.
2014-04-29HouseAdopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ito, Takai excused (2).
2014-04-25HouseDeferred one day 04-29-14.
2014-04-25HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1700-14), recommending adoption.
2014-04-17HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem.
2014-04-17HouseResolution re-scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 04-17-14 1:35PM in conference room 308.
2014-04-15HouseResolution scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 04-17-14 1:35PM in conference room 309.
2014-04-15HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Oshiro, Wooley excused (3).
2014-04-15HouseReported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1673-14), recommending referral to FIN.
2014-04-14HouseThe committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Choy, Ichiyama, Awana, Hanohano, Ohno, Takumi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Say, Takai, Fale.
2014-04-10HouseResolution re-scheduled to be heard by HED on Monday, 04-14-14 10:30AM in conference room 329.
2014-04-10HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by HED on Monday, 04-14-14 9:00AM in conference room 329.
2014-04-08HouseReferred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 50
2014-04-03HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 472).
2014-04-03SenateReport and Resolution Adopted. Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Transmitted to House.
2014-04-03SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3268) with recommendation of adoption.
2014-04-01SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, English.
2014-03-28SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-01-14 9:00AM in conference room 211.
2014-03-25SenateReport adopted, referred to WAM.
2014-03-25SenateReported from HRE/JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3105), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
2014-03-24SenateThe committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Solomon; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Ihara.
2014-03-24SenateThe committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Kahele, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Tokuda.
2014-03-20SenateThe committee(s) on HRE/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-24-14 11:00AM in conference room 016.
2014-03-13SenateReferred to HRE/JDL, WAM.
2014-03-07SenateOffered.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback