HI SCR112 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-22 - (S) The committee on TIA deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-22 - (S) The committee on TIA deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting A Recommendation On Increased Penalties For The Offense Of Habitually Operating A Vehicle Under The Influence Of An Intoxicant.
Title
Driving Under the Influence; DOT Study on Increased Penalties
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-22 | (S) The committee on TIA deferred the measure. | |
2010-03-18 | (S) The committee(s) on TIA added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 03-22-10 1:15PM in conference room 224. | |
2010-03-10 | (S) Referred to TIA, JGO. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR44 (Same As) 2010-03-10 - (S) Referred to TIA, JGO.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=112&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/SCR112_.HTM |