HI SCR111 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-25 - (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on HSG/WLO with Representative(s) Marumoto, Thielen voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Oshiro excused (1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-25 - (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on HSG/WLO with Representative(s) Marumoto, Thielen voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Oshiro excused (1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The City And County Of Honolulu To Preserve Existing Affordable Housing And Create New Affordable Housing Opportunities, Family-oriented Support Services, Health Centers, Community Centers, Retail Services Related To Healthy Living, And Community Gardens Within Transit-oriented Development Zones Along The Honolulu Rail Transit Project Corridor.
Title
Transit-Oriented Development; Affordable Housing; Family-Oriented Support Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-25 | (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on HSG/WLO with Representative(s) Marumoto, Thielen voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Oshiro excused (1). | |
2012-04-25 | (H) Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1808-12), recommending referral to HSG/WLO. | |
2012-04-23 | (H) The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Souki, Ichiyama, Aquino, Cullen, M. Lee, Yamashita, Fontaine, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Luke, Saiki, Takumi. | |
2012-04-20 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by TRN on Monday, 04-23-12 1:30PM in conference room 225. | |
2012-04-16 | (H) Referred to TRN, HSG/WLO, referral sheet 66 | |
2012-04-13 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 720) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2012-04-13 | (S) Report and Resolution Adopted as amended (SD 1). Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-04-12 | (S) One Day Notice 04-13-12. | |
2012-04-12 | (S) Reported from WLH/PGM/HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3380) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). | |
2012-04-11 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Ihara, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2012-04-10 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS deferred the measure until 04-11-12 12:50PM in conference room 229. | |
2012-04-10 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PGM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Kidani, Baker, Ryan; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2012-04-10 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WLH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Solomon, Ryan, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga, Tokuda, Slom. | |
2012-04-05 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH/PGM/HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 04-10-12 2:30PM in conference room 225. | |
2012-03-16 | (S) Referred to WLH/PGM/HMS. | |
2012-03-14 | (S) Offered. |