HI SCR104 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-17 - (S) The committee on EDH deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-17 - (S) The committee on EDH deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Submittal Of Annual Reports And The Convening Of Semi-annual Meetings On The Status Of Its Reform Activities.
Title
DOE; Reform; Report to Legislature
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-17 | (S) The committee on EDH deferred the measure. | |
2010-03-12 | (S) The committee(s) on EDH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-10 1:15PM in conference room 225. | |
2010-03-10 | (S) Referred to EDH. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=104&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/SCR104_.HTM |