HI SCR103 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urging The Inclusion Of Native Hawaiian Cultural Intervention Treatment Programs, Wellness Plans, And Holistic Living Systems Of Care In The State Of Hawaii's Response To The Rise Of Misuse And Abuse Of Opioids Or Illicit Substances In Hawaii.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging The Inclusion Of Native Hawaiian Cultural Intervention Treatment Programs, Wellness Plans, And Holistic Living Systems Of Care In The State Of Hawaii's Response To The Rise Of Misuse And Abuse Of Opioids Or Illicit Substances In Hawaii.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-15HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
2019-04-15HouseReported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2252), recommending referral to JUD.
2019-04-11HouseThe committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Say, Tokioka.
2019-04-08HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 04-11-19 9:15AM in conference room 329.
2019-04-05HouseReferred to HLT, JUD, referral sheet 50
2019-04-04HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 612).
2019-04-04SenateReport and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
2019-04-03SenateOne Day Notice 04-04-19.
2019-04-03SenateReported from HWN/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1745) with recommendation of adoption.
2019-03-28SenateThe committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HWN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, K. Kahele, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Fevella.
2019-03-28SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, J.Keohokalole, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang, Nishihara, Fevella.
2019-03-18SenateThe committee(s) on HWN/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-19 1:16PM in conference room 016.
2019-03-12SenateReferred to HWN/CPH.
2019-03-08SenateOffered.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback