HI SCR101 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR101
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-31 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-31 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Hawaii Public Housing Authority To Document Violations Of The Prohibition On Smoking In And Around Public Housing.
Title
Requesting The Hawaii Public Housing Authority To Document Violations Of The Prohibition On Smoking In And Around Public Housing.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] |
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-31 | Senate | The committee on CPH deferred the measure. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | The committee on HOU deferred the measure. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-31-17 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Referred to HOU/CPH. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR101 (Carry Over) 2017-03-31 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
HCR114 (Same As) 2017-04-07 - Referred to HOU, JDL.
HCR114 (Same As) 2017-04-07 - Referred to HOU, JDL.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=101&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/SCR101_.HTM |