HI SB997 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB997
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WLH with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Nakamura, Quinlan, Takumi excused (4).
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WLH with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Nakamura, Quinlan, Takumi excused (4).
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Stadium Development District. Requires HCDA to facilitate the development of all state property within the District. Appropriates funds and authorizes the issuance of reimbursable general obligation bonds to establish and develop the District. Authorizes the issuance of general obligation bonds to build a new stadium. (SB997 HD1)
Title
Relating To The Stadium Authority.
Sponsors
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] |
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WLH with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Nakamura, Quinlan, Takumi excused (4). |
2019-03-15 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1366) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to WLH. |
2019-03-14 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Eli, Kitagawa, McKelvey, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Quinlan. |
2019-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 03-14-19 9:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to LAB, WLH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 28 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 524) in amended form (SD 2). |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Harimoto, L. Thielen). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-19. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report filed. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Separated Committee Report. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted as amended (SD 2). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Floor Amendment No. 7 offered. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1196) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, English, Harimoto, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-26-19 10:05AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-25-19 10:25AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from EET/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 655) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Inouye, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Baker. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, Inouye, J.Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-19 3:15PM in conference room 414. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to EET/GVO, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB997 (Carry Over) 2019-03-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WLH with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Nakamura, Quinlan, Takumi excused (4).