HI SB994 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB994
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - The committee on TEC deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - The committee on TEC deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the Hawaii technology development corporation for the small business innovation research program.
Title
Relating To Hawaii Technology Development Corporation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | Senate | The committee on TEC deferred the measure. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | The committee on EET deferred the measure. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET/TEC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-19 2:50PM in conference room 414. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Re-Referred to EET/TEC, WAM. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-01-19 3:00PM in conference room 414. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-19 3:00PM in conference room 414. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to EET, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB994 (Carry Over) 2019-02-05 - The committee on TEC deferred the measure.
HB340 (Same As) 2019-06-12 - Act 055, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1156).
HB1128 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to HSH/HSG, FIN, referral sheet 6
HB340 (Same As) 2019-06-12 - Act 055, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1156).
HB1128 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to HSH/HSG, FIN, referral sheet 6
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Hawaii Technology Development Corporation
Small Business Innovation Research Program
Hawaii Technology Development Corporation
Small Business Innovation Research Program
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=994&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB994_.HTM |