HI SB991 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Act 229, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1331).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Caps annual utility rate increases without PUC approval for counties with a population of less than 500,000. Provides telecommunications service providers with flexibility from certain regulatory oversight requirements including issuance of securities and other evidences of indebtedness, and sales or disposition of property or equipment, if the utility is providing fully competitive retail services and specific conditions are met. Specifies other requirements related to flexibility for telecommunications service providers. (CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Telecommunications.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-09SenateAct 229, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1331).
2019-07-09HouseAct 229, on 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1331).
2019-05-06SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2019-05-02SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883).
2019-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968).
2019-04-30SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2019-04-26HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19.
2019-04-26HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 101) as amended in (CD 1).
2019-04-26Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19.
2019-04-26SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 101).
2019-04-25HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, Takumi, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
2019-04-25SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang.
2019-04-24SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-25-19 1:15PM in conference room 229.
2019-04-24SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 852).
2019-04-23HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Ohno, Takumi, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; McDermott.
2019-04-22HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 951).
2019-04-22SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; S. Chang, Fevella.
2019-04-11HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 893).
2019-04-11SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2019-04-11SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 763).
2019-04-09HousePassed Third Reading with Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ward voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-04-05HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2189), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-04-04HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto.
2019-04-03HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 04-04-19 2:15PM in conference room 308.
2019-03-29HouseThe committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2019-03-27HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 03-29-19 3:30PM in House conference room 308.
2019-03-22HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).
2019-03-22HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1587), recommending referral to FIN.
2019-03-19HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Cachola, Har, Kong, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Mizuno.
2019-03-15HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 03-19-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
2019-03-15HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) San Buenaventura voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Nakamura, Quinlan, Takumi excused (4).
2019-03-15HouseReported from IAC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1330) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
2019-03-12HouseThe committees on IAC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, D. Kobayashi, Gates, Kong, Nishimoto, Takayama, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2019-03-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by IAC on Tuesday, 03-12-19 10:00AM in House conference room 430.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to IAC, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 322) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-03-05SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-03-01Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
2019-03-01SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2019-03-01SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 841) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-02-27SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Ruderman.
2019-02-26SenateThe committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 02-27-19 10:15AM in conference room 229.
2019-02-22SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has rescheduled its public hearing to 02-26-19 8:30AM in conference room 229.
2019-02-20SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-26-19 9:00AM in conference room 229.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to CPH.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB272 (Same As) 2019-04-22 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 950).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback