HI SB990 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB990
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes a county with a pre-existing surcharge to continue the surcharge after December 31, 2030 at a lower rate of one-fourth per cent. Authorizes counties that have not adopted a surcharge ordinance on state tax to adopt a surcharge ordinance at the current rate of one-half of one per cent through December 31, 2030 and at a rate of one-fourth of one per cent after December 31, 2030. Amends restrictions on the use of surcharge revenues to more than capital costs for counties with a population greater than five hundred thousand.
Title
Relating To Taxation.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to PSM/TRS, WAM. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB990 (Carry Over) 2021-01-29 - Referred to PSM/TRS, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=990&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB990_.HTM |