HI SB990 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB990
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-19 12:46PM in conference room 224.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-19 12:46PM in conference room 224.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism (DBEDT) to engage a consulting firm to conduct a study to evaluate policies and organizational changes needed within DBEDT that will enable the State to successfully execute a technology-based economic development strategy. Appropriates funds for DBEDT to engage the consulting firm to conduct the study. (SB990 HD1)
Title
Relating To The Hawaii Technology Development Corporation.
Sponsors
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-19 12:46PM in conference room 224. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-19 12:46PM in conference room 224. |
2019-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 920). |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Wakai Chair; J.Keohokalole, Kanuha Co-Chairs; Fevella. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 809). |
2019-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: McKelvey, Kitagawa Co-Chairs; Ichiyama, Matsumoto. |
2019-04-05 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 685). |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Deferred One Day 04-05-19. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 551). |
2019-04-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-04-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1970), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-03-27 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Gates, Hashimoto, B. Kobayashi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Holt, Kitagawa, Matayoshi, McDermott. |
2019-03-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-27-19 2:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2). |
2019-03-22 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1653) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-03-20 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kitagawa, Eli, Ichiyama, Johanson, Quinlan, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2019-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-20-19 11:30AM in conference room 309. |
2019-03-15 | House | The committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-20-19 11:30am. |
2019-03-14 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 03-15-19 11:30AM in conference room 309. |
2019-03-13 | House | The committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-15-19 11:30am. |
2019-03-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Wednesday, 03-13-19 10:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 321) in amended form (SD 2). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 871) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2019-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Riviere. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-21-19 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from EET/TEC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 548) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TEC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) J.Keohokalole, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Moriwaki. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, Inouye, J.Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET/TEC deferred the measure until 02-11-19 3:00PM in conference room 414. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET/TEC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-19 2:45PM in conference room 414. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to EET/TEC, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB990 (Carry Over) 2019-04-24 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-19 12:46PM in conference room 224.
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
DBEDT
Hawaii Technology Development Corporation
Study
Technologybased Economic Development Strategy
DBEDT
Hawaii Technology Development Corporation
Study
Technologybased Economic Development Strategy