HI SB988 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB988
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Referred to LAT, CPC, referral sheet 24
Pending: House Labor & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Referred to LAT, CPC, referral sheet 24
Pending: House Labor & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes clear guidelines for unpaid internships under the state wage and hour law. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Labor.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to LAT, CPC, referral sheet 24 |
2022-02-03 | House | Pass First Reading |
2022-02-02 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 11) in amended form (SD 1). |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Kidani). Transmitted to House. |
2022-01-31 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 02-02-22. |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2003) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2022-01-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Lee. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 01-25-22 9:30AM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Re-Referred to JDC. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to LCA, JDC. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1196 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB988 (Carry Over) 2021-02-12 - Re-Referred to JDC.
SB988 (Carry Over) 2021-02-12 - Re-Referred to JDC.